Castagna, Luigi Alexander (CPSO#: 50374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 415
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-4848
Fax: (416) 431-5940
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

225-2330 MIDLAND AVE
Toronto ON  M1S 5G5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911 Ext. 6120
Fax: 416-292-9678
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castagna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Castagna ( CPSO# 63015 )
Dr. L. Castagna ( CPSO# 50374 )

Business Address:
415 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-4848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIGI ALEXANDER CASTAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTAGNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1984