Castelli, Mario Francesco (CPSO#: 22058)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 7 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Greenestone Endoscopy Clinic Unit 320 790 Bay Street Toronto, ON M5G 1N8 Tel: 4166135050 Fax: 4166135051
Instructions: Greenestone Endoscopy Clinic Unit 300 5734 Yonge Street Toronto, ON M2M 4E7 Tel: 4162225501 Fax: 4162221932
Date Received: 25 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 1, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Mario Francesco Castelli to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Mario Francesco Castelli:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.

(4) Acknowledge that I have resigned from the College effective July 1, 2014.

(6) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(7) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(11) Acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

(13) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(14) Consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register as information that is available to the public.