Castiglione, Alberto (CPSO#: 66480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All In One Health Care Station
10083 Keele Street
Suite 100
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone: (905) 832-4644
Fax: (905) 832-7717
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castiglione Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Castiglione ( CPSO# 66480 )

Business Address:
All In One Health Care Station
10083 Keele Street
Suite 100
Maple ON  L6A 3Y8
Phone Number: (905) 832-4644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERTO CASTIGLIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTIGLIONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995