Castle, Warren George (CPSO#: 21482)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 719 Island Park Dr Ottawa, ON K1Y 0B8
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017