Castro, Carmencita San Luis (CPSO#: 42437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Indiana University Health-Methodist
1701 Senate Boulevard
Indianapolis IN  46202
United States
Phone: (317) 312-9034

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMENCITA SAN LUIS CASTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983