Castro Mendez, Lucas (CPSO#: 108205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Escola de Medicina e Saude Publica, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS CASTRO MENDEZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CASTRO MENDEZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018