Catalan, Grace Landayan Galila (CPSO#: 75430)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2014 to 19 Jan 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Jan 2015 to 06 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2015