Catania, Amy Margaret Kathleen (CPSO#: 77780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: Horvat, Amy Margaret Kathleen (used until: 07 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Main Street East
Shelburne ON  L9V 2Z4
Phone: 2262599000
Fax: 226-486-0126
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Catania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Catania ( CPSO# 77780 )

Business Address:
167 Centre Street
Shelburne ON  L9V 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 925-0017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY MARGARET KATHLEEN CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2005