Catford, Erika Adele (CPSO#: 82896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 330-3520
Fax: (705) 330-3521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erika Catford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Catford ( CPSO# 82896 )

Business Address:
16 O'Brien Street
Suite 301
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 330-3520


Corporation Name: Dr. Erika Catford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Catford ( CPSO# 82896 )

Business Address:
301 - 16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 330-3520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIKA ADELE CATFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007