Catona, Tamara (CPSO#: 63422)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamara Catona Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2007

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: #301 1676 Martin Drive Surrey, British Columbia V4A 6E7
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008