Catre, Melanio Garcia (CPSO#: 66638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 461-4761
Fax: (416) 461-5574
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-4761
Fax: (416) 461-5574
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Catre ( CPSO# 66638 )

Business Address:
304 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-4761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIO GARCIA CATRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Oct 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000