Cattan, Edouard Fouad Edouard (CPSO#: 50824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2530 St Joseph Boulevard
Unit 6
Orleans ON  K1C 1G1
Phone: (613) 830-1004
Fax: (613) 830-9689
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edouard Cattan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cattan ( CPSO# 50824 )

Business Address:
6 - 2530 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 830-1004

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDOUARD FOUAD EDOUARD CATTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983