Catton, Charles Nicholas (CPSO#: 29910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2983
Fax: (416) 946-4586
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Catton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Catton ( CPSO# 29910 )

Business Address:
The Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2983

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES NICHOLAS CATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1978