Catton, Lianne Letitia (CPSO#: 81173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Porcupine Health Unit
169 Pine St South
Post Bag 2012
Timmins ON  P4N 8B7
Phone: 705-267-1181
Fax: 705-264-3980
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lianne Catton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Catton ( CPSO# 81173 )

Business Address:
Porcupine Health Unit
169 Pine Street South
Timmins ON  P4N 2K3
Phone Number: (705) 267-1181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE LETITIA CATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008