Cattran, Daniel Cheyne (CPSO#: 24549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8N184
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4187
Fax: (416) 340-3714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel C. Cattran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cattran ( CPSO# 24549 )

Business Address:
Suite 8N184
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL CHEYNE CATTRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTRAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1972