Caturay, Gregorio Resus (CPSO#: 22303)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2008