Catz-Biro, Laura (CPSO#: 65788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
2409 Yonge street
Toronto ON  M5M 1B2
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge st
Suite 404
Richmond Hill ON  L4E4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1777
Fax: (905) 773-4444
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Henrietta Banting Breast Center
Women's college hospital
76 Grenville Street 5th floor ,
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6225
Fax: (416) 323-7730
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catz-Biro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Catz-Biro ( CPSO# 65788 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 787-3771

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA CATZ-BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATZ-BIRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993