Cauchi, Mario Mark (CPSO#: 22743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Apr 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C P M Centres for Pain Management
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 288-1045
Fax: (905) 858-2144
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mario Cauchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cauchi ( CPSO# 22743 )

Business Address:
10016 The Trail
P.O. Box 34
HW #2
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0

Business Address:
Centres for Pain Management
6400 Millcreek Drive
Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  February  15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mario Mark Cauchi, in
            accordance with an undertaking  and  consent given by Dr. Cauchi to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                                    DR. MARIO MARK CAUCHI
                                          ("Dr. Cauchi")
                                                to 
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College;
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi, certificate of registration number 22743, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Cauchi,  acknowledge  that  concerns  have  been  identified  with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern  about  protecting  the  public.  I acknowledge the nature of the
                  College's concerns.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake to abide by the provisions  of this Undertaking,
                  effective from the date I sign it, ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi,  undertake  to  practise under the guidance  of  a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable  to  the  College  (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"),  for  twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"),
                        as set out in the Undertaking  of the Clinical Supervisor, Appendix
                        A and the attached IEP, Appendix B. 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi, acknowledge that  I  have  reviewed  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking  attached  hereto  as  Appendix  "A", and
                        understand  what  is  required  of  the  Clinical Supervisor(s), as
                        follows:
                  
                        (i)   Clinical Supervision will commence at a moderate level for at
                              least the first six (6) months, commencing  on  the  date the
                              Clinical  Supervisor(s)  signs  Appendix  "A"  (the "Moderate
                              Level Supervision");
                  
                        (ii)  During   the   Moderate   Level   Supervision,  the  Clinical
                              Supervisor  will review materials, have  an  initial  meeting
                              with me to discuss  practice  improvement recommendations and
                              meet with me monthly to review a minimum of twenty (20) of my
                              patient  charts,  discuss  my  care,   treatment   plan   and
                              follow-up,   identify   any   concerns  regarding  the  care,
                              treatment  plan and follow-up and  make  recommendations  for
                              improvement;
                  
                        (iii) After six (6)  months,  and  only  upon recommendation of the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) and subject to  the  approval  of  the
                              College, the Clinical Supervision may be reduced to low level
                              supervision  for the remaining six (6) months (the "Low Level
                              Supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  During the Low  Level  Supervision, the frequency of meetings
                              and chart reviews by the Clinical Supervisor(s) shall be on a
                              quarterly basis (every three (3) months);
                  
                        (v)   The Clinical Supervisor(s)  will  report  to the College on a
                              bi-monthly  basis  during  the  period  of moderate  Clinical
                              Supervision, and quarterly while under Low Level Supervision,
                              or  more  frequently  if  the  Clinical  Supervisor  (s)  has
                              concerns about my standard of practice;
                  
                        (vi)  The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                              reviewed along with patient identifiers;
                  
                        (vii) The  Clinical  Supervisor(s)  will facilitate  the  education
                              program set out in the IEP attached as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (viii)The Clinical Supervisor(s)  will  make  recommendations to me
                              for    practice   improvements   and   ongoing   professional
                              development   and   inquire   into  my  compliance  with  the
                              recommendations; and
                  
                        (ix)  The Clinical Supervisor(s) will  perform  any  other  duties,
                              such  as  reviewing  other documents or conducting interviews
                              with staff or colleagues that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem
                              necessary to my Clinical Supervision. 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi, acknowledge that  the  charts  reviewed  shall  be
                        selected by  the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)  based on the educational
                        needs  identified  in  the  IEP  set  out  at Appendix  "B"  to  my
                        Undertaking,  as  well as the areas of concern  identified  in  the
                        report(s) of the medical  inspector Dr. Edward Wasser dated January
                        15, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr. Cauchi, undertake to  cooperate  fully  with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my  practice  described  in  section  (5)  of this
                        Undertaking  and  Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide  by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited   to  recommended   practice   improvements   and   ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Cauchi,  acknowledge that in making its determination that I
                        may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I
                        sign  a  further  undertaking   imposing   terms,   conditions  and
                        limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring  ongoing
                        re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi,  undertake  to  ensure  that  Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking  is signed and delivered to the College  within  thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Cauchi,  undertake  that  if  a  person  who  has  given  an
                        undertaking  in  Appendix  "A"  to  this  Undertaking  is unable or
                        unwilling  to  continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall,  within
                        twenty (20) days  of  receiving  notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from  a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake that if I am  unable  to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (g)  above,  including
                        returning  a  signed  Appendix "A" within twenty (20) days, I  will
                        cease practising medicine  until  such  time  as  I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that if I am required to  cease practise
                        as  a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute  a  term,
                        condition  or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition  or  limitation  will  be  included  on  the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi,  undertake  to  participate  in  and  successfully
                        complete  the  following  professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"), as set out in Appendix B:
                  
                        (i)   program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    Medical Record Keeping (University of Toronto), 
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed  IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B", including review of policies and guidelines as described
                              therein; and
                  
                        (iii) any  additional  professional  education  recommended  by  my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake to provide proof  to  the  College  of  my
                        successful  completion  of  the  Professional  Education, including
                        proof  of  registration  and attendance and participant  assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month  of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its  sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to  the  College  regarding my progress  and  compliance  with  the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake  to  complete  this requirement within six
                        (6)  months  of  signing this undertaking or,  if  no  satisfactory
                        program  is  available   by   that  time,  by  the  first  possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake that,  approximately  six (6) months after
                        the   completion  of  the  Clinical  Supervision  and  professional
                        education  set  out  above  and  in  Appendix  "A" and Appendix "B"
                        attached,  I  will  submit  to a reassessment of my  practice  (the
                        "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the  "Assessor(s)").   I acknowledge  that  the  Reassessment  may
                        include a chart review, direct  observation  of my care, interviews
                        with  colleagues  and co-workers, feedback from  patients  and  any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake  to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking and to abide by the
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge  and  provide  consent  that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)   may   receive  and  review  the  findings  of   the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss  with  the  Assessor(s)  any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the
                        results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and  reported to
                        the College and the report may form the basis of further  action by
                        the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Cauchi, undertake to inform the College of each and  every
                        location that  I  practise  or  have privileges, including, but not
                        limited  to,  hospital(s),  clinic(s)   and   office(s),   in   any
                        jurisdiction   (collectively  my  "Practice  Location(s)"),  within
                        fifteen (15) days  of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen  (15)  days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cauchi, undertake that I will  submit  to, and not interfere
                        with,  unannounced  inspections  of  my  Practice  Location(s)  and
                        patient  records  by a College representative for the  purposes  of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (9)   I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I,  Dr.  Cauchi,  acknowledge  and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible for payment  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions of  this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived  my  right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,  at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr.  Cauchi,  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may  result  in  any  one  or  more of the following:
                  consideration  by  the QAC, an investigation by the College,  or  further
                  action by the College,  including  a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I,  Dr.  Cauchi,  acknowledge that this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations  on  my  certificate  of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall  be  posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that the following summary will appear  on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Concerns   have  been  identified  with  respect  to  Dr.  Cauchi's
                        knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                        *     Dr. Cauchi  will  practise  under  the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                        *     Dr. Cauchi will engage in professional  education  in Medical
                              Record Keeping.
                        *     Dr.  Cauchi's  practice  will  be  reassessed  by an assessor
                              selected  by  the College within 6 months of the end  of  the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I,  Dr.  Cauchi, give my irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make
                  appropriate  enquiries  of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Cauchi, acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP  consent  form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (19)  I, Dr. Cauchi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide  the
                  following  information to any person who facilitates my completion of the
                  professional  education  set out in section (6) above and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising  from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from  the  monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Cauchi, give my irrevocable consent  to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising  from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Cauchi, give my irrevocable consent to all  Clinical  Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any person who facilitates my  completion
                  of  the  professional education set out in section (6) above, to disclose
                  to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant  for  the  purposes  of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention  in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential  risk  of  harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            As  from  August  6,  2003, Dr. Mario Mark Cauchi undertakes to the College  of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he will,

                  1.    not perform cosmetic procedures;
                  
                  2.    provide at  least  three  month's  written  notice  to  the Quality
                        Assurance  Committee  of  the  College  if he wishes to resume  his
                        practice performing cosmetic procedures; and
                  
                  3.    comply  with  all  assessment,  review  and enhancement  activities
                        directed  by  the  Quality  Assurance  Committee   before  resuming
                        practice in cosmetic medicine.
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jan 2003
Summary:

 On January 20, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cauchi committed professional 
 misconduct in that he falsified a record relating to his practice and committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.

On April 16, 
 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered and direct that:

1.	 Dr. Cauchi attend before the panel to 
 be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	The Registrar 
 suspend Dr. Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing on 
 May 1, 2003.  Two (2) months of the suspension will be suspended on the condition that Dr. Cauchi 
 successfully complete a course in ethics acceptable to the Registrar, the course to be completed 
 by May 1, 2004.

3.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
 Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) years; Dr. Cauchi is not to 
 practice as a sole practitioner in an independent practice and is to practice only in a setting 
 acceptable to the Registrar with a partner or partners, supervisor or employer.

4.	Dr. Cauchi pay 
 a portion of the College(s costs, fixed in the amount of $2,500 by April 1, 2004.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 20, 2003


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 1999
Summary:

 On October 8, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Cauchi(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Cauchi is 
 to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2.	Dr. Cauchi is to 
 pay $5,000.00 fine to the Minister of Finance.
3.	Dr. Cauchi is to pay $3,000.00 in costs to the 
 College.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 08, 1999

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mario Mark Cauchi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 15, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Cauchi's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

- Dr. Cauchi will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
- Dr. Cauchi will engage in professional education in Medical Record Keeping.
- Dr. Cauchi's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.