Caughell, Keith Albert (CPSO#: 50375)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 05 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jan 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Oct 1999
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Jan 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Sep 1999
Summary:

 On September 22, 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Caughell guilty of professional 
 misconduct with regard to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and 
 misconduct of a sexual nature.  In addition, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Caughell guilty of 
 incompetence.  On October 20, 1999, the Discipline Committee suspended Dr. Caughell(s certificate 
 of registration until the matter before the Discipline Committee is disposed of.  

On January 5, 
 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke his certificate of registration 
 effective immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 29 Jan 2002
Hearing Date(s): Sep 14, 1998