Caughey, Sharon Catherine (CPSO#: 57266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 739-4711
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON CATHERINE CAUGHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUGHEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988