Caughey, William Gordon (CPSO#: 21442)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Bracebridge Mini Storage 1711 Winhara Road Bracebridge, ON P1L 1W1
Date Received: 16 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014