Caulfeild, Roddy Terence (CPSO#: 23969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
PO Box 1800
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-2082
Fax: (519) 372-3933
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Owen Sound Billy Bishop
Regional Airport
RR#8, #203807
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5W4
Canada
Phone: (519) 371-6936
Fax: (519) 371-5197
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.T. Caulfeild Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Caulfeild ( CPSO# 23969 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
RR 8
203807
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5W4
Phone Number: (519) 371-6936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roddy Terence
            Caulfeild, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Caulfeild
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. RODDY TERENCE CAULFEILD
                                          ("Dr. Caulfeild")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, certificate of registration number 23969, am a member
                  of the College.  I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my family practice. I am aware of the College's concern about
                  protecting the public.

            (3)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, currently practise surgical assisting only at Grey
                  Bruce Health Services: Markdale, Meaford and Owen Sound Hospital and
                  civil aviation medicine only at Billy Bishop Airport in Owen Sound
                  (collectively, my "Practice Locations").

            (4)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, do not practice at any practice location, including but
                  not limited to, any clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction other than
                  my Practice Locations listed in section (3) above, and I do not hold
                  privileges at any hospital, other than my Practice Locations listed in
                  section (3) above.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that I will not engage in the practice
                        of medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that the entirety of my scope of
                        practice will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practice medicine:
                  
                              a.    as a surgical assistant of a surgeon who:
                  
                                    i.    is certified by the Royal College of Physicians
                                          and Surgeons or recognized as a surgical
                                          specialist by the College; and
                  
                                    ii.   holds privileges at a Practice Location approved
                                          by the College,
                  
                                          (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                              b.    by performing civil aviation medical examinations.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge, for further clarity, but without
                        limiting the generality of  section (6)(b)(i)(a) above, that:
                  
                        (i)   I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative care
                              whatsoever; and
                  
                        (ii)  a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in attendance
                              when I am engaging in my practice as a surgical assistant.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that I will not engage in any practice
                        of medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in
                        section (6)(b) above. I acknowledge that this includes not treating
                        patients outside of my scope of practice as outlined in section
                        (6)(b) above and not prescribing medication. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that I shall obtain a signed consent
                        from any person before conducting an aviation medical examination
                        on him or her in the form set out at Appendix "A."  I undertake to
                        retain the original signed consents for a minimum of fifteen (15)
                        years or longer if required in accordance with the College's third
                        party reports policy and any applicable legislation and regulation.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that I will not commence surgical
                        assisting at any practice location without prior approval of the
                        College. Should I seek privileges to perform surgical assisting at
                        any other Practice Location, I shall advise the College within five
                        (5) days of making such application, and shall seek approval to
                        practice surgical assisting at the Practice Location at least
                        fourteen (14) days before I plan to commence surgical assisting at
                        that location.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake to inform the College of any and all
                        new civil aviation medicine Practice Locations within five (5) days
                        of commencing practice at that location.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that I have read the College's policy on
                  third party reports, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  I acknowledge I am bound by this policy and any such equivalent policies
                  as may apply to me in the future.

            (8)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                  provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a
                  colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Caulfeild has voluntarily undertaken to restrict his
                              practice such that he may only practice medicine: 
                  
                              (i)   as a surgical assistant under the direction of a
                                    surgeon; and/or 
                  
                              (ii)  by performing civil aviation medical examinations. 
                  
                              In his practice, Dr. Caulfeild will not treat patients
                              outside his scope of practice and will not prescribe
                              medication to any person. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (18)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Qualified Surgeons and Chiefs of Staff with any information arising
                  from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Caulfeild, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon
                  and any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another,
                  all information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the
                  purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.   

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr, Roddy Terence Caulfeild to the Collge of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective August 8, 2017:

Dr. Caulfeild has voluntarily undertaken to restrict his practice such that he may only practice medicine:

(i) as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon; and/or

(ii) by performing civil aviation medical examinations.

In his practice, Dr. Caulfeild will not treat patients outside his scope of practice and will not prescribe medication to any person.