Causer, Petrina Ann (CPSO#: 69080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
General Site
Medical Imaging Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Sheppard Ave E, suite 125
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1100 Sheppard Ave E, suite 103
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 233-4886
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1450 O'Connor Dr, building 1, unit
Toronto ON  M2K 2T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 759-3223
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3292 Bayview Ave, Suite 206-207
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 427-0195
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Causer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Causer ( CPSO# 69080 )

Business Address:
100 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1

Business Address:
103 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2

Business Address:
12 - 1250 O'Connor Drive
Scarborough ON  M4B 1Z7

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
1NE-741
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETRINA ANN CAUSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000