Cava, Josefina Macaraeg (CPSO#: 42424)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Far Eastern University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015