Cavanagh, Angela Dawn (CPSO#: 105929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  13 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 6135332543
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA DAWN CAVANAGH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CAVANAGH is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CAVANAGH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CAVANAGH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CAVANAGH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CAVANAGH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CAVANAGH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 13 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2018