Cavazzoni, Patrizia (CPSO#: 58443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10903 New Hampshire Avenue
Silver Spring MD  20993
United States
Phone: (301)594-5400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRIZIA CAVAZZONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAVAZZONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988