Caverhill, John Warwick (CPSO#: 19322)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1991

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Sep 1994
Summary:

 In September 1994, Dr. Caverhill pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety 
 with a patient.  Dr. Caverhill also pleaded guilty to a charge of incompetence, as defined in s. 
 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  The 
 Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Caverhill(s plea of guilty to these charges, and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct and incompetence.  The Committee also accepted a joint 
 submission as to penalty.  Consequently, the Committee acknowledged Dr. Caverhill(s resignation of 
 his licence to practice, as well as his undertaking not to re-apply for a licence in Ontario or 
 any other jurisdiction.  The Committee ordered that Dr. Caverhill be reprimanded, with the fact of 
 the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  It further ordered that on or before 30 September 
 1994 he provide the College with an irrevocable letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00, 
 which was to be in place for a period of five years from 19 September 1994, on terms acceptable to 
 the Registrar, as security for therapy and counselling.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 19, 1994