Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cawkwell, Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
209 Oak Park Blvd
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6H 0M2
Phone: (905) 845-8771
Fax: (905) 845-8379
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Aids/Sexual Health Clinic
232 South Service Road
Oakville
Oakville ON  L6J 2X5
Canada
Phone: (905) 825-6000 Ext. 7788
Fax: (905) 825-9010
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cawkwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cawkwell ( CPSO# 58479 )

Business Address:
202 - 209 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 845-8771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ELIZABETH CAWKWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAWKWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 21 Dec 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988