Cayo, Jacques Stanley (CPSO#: 96143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite Notre Dame d'Haiti, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013