Ceaser, Jack Douglas (CPSO#: 77580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood Sport Medicine
10 Keith Avenue
Unit 105
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0W5
Phone: 705-444-5303
Fax: 705-444-0723
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jack Ceaser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ceaser ( CPSO# 77580 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
GBHS
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3230

Business Address:
GBHS
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Business Address:
Collingwood Sport Medicine
105 - 10 Keith Avenue
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0W5
Phone Number: (705) 444-5303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK DOUGLAS CEASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004