Cejic, Sonny Sinisa (CPSO#: 70391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cejic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cejic ( CPSO# 70391 )

Business Address:
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-9670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONNY SINISA CEJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEJIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998