Ceolin-Wietfeldt, Sandra (CPSO#: 68298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Ceolin, Sandra (used until: 22 Jul 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thistlewood Professional Centre
8077 Islington Avenue
Suite 306
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 856-8714
Fax: (905) 856-4036
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA CEOLIN-WIETFELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEOLIN-WIETFELDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996