Ceresne, Lance Alan (CPSO#: 74013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
236 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Phone: (416) 922-2000
Fax: (416) 922-2005
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANCE ALAN CERESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERESNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001