Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cerovsky, Lenka (CPSO#: 58041)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013