Cesar Rittenberg, Paula Victoria (CPSO#: 67691)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Cesar, Paula Victoria (used until: 26 Jun 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 1994 to 01 Apr 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 May 1994 to 14 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999