Cescon, David Ward (CPSO#: 82898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre/UHN
Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2245
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Cescon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cescon ( CPSO# 82898 )

Business Address:
UHN-Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WARD CESCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CESCON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009