Cha, Charlie Yi Keh (CPSO#: 58316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 533-6807
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLIE YI KEH CHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1988