Cha, James Yi-Ming (CPSO#: 54281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Medical Arts Building
300 King Street West
Suite 203
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone: (905) 725-8632
Fax: (905) 725-2348
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES YI-MING CHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Feb 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1988