Cha, Lily Shao-Li (CPSO#: 53316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1020 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1G6
Phone: (416) 633-7201
Fax: (416) 633-8576
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lily Cha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY SHAO-LI CHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1988