Chaban, Roman John (CPSO#: 52762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 781-4000
Fax: (416) 781-2414
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMAN JOHN CHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHABAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985