Chacko, Sanoj Mathew (CPSO#: 111046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANOJ MATHEW CHACKO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CHACKO is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CHACKO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHACKO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHACKO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CHACKO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CHACKO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Oct 2016 to 22 Dec 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 23 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018