Chacon, Danelia De Jesus (CPSO#: 52071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Caraboba, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Y6
Phone: (613) 596-2872
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 13 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANELIA DE JESUS CHACON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1988