Chada, Reena Rani (CPSO#: 86331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
726 Bloor Street West
Suite B101
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone: 647-350-5445
Fax: 647-350-5446
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reena Rani Chada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chada ( CPSO# 86331 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
799 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone Number: (647) 349-0053

Business Address:
B101 - 726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: (647) 350-5445

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA RANI CHADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009