Chadda, Jasjot Kaur (CPSO#: 62269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1858
2 St Clair West
Toronto ON  M4V 2L5
Phone: (416) 921-6525
Fax: (647) 255-8012
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASJOT KAUR CHADDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991