Chadha, Ashok Kumar (CPSO#: 57279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone: (613) 389-6679
Fax: (613) 389-6615
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Urgent Care Centre
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Canada
Phone: (613) 389-3348
Fax: (613) 389-6615
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chadha ( CPSO# 57279 )

Business Address:
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 389-6679

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ashok Kumar Chadha,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chadha to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ASHOK KUMAR CHADHA 
                                          ("Dr. Chadha")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chadha, certificate of registration number 57279, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that the College received information
                  regarding my standard of practice pursuant to a chart review in File
                  Number 356909. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that the College investigated a complaint
                  bearing File Number 100592 regarding my standard of practice and
                  allegations that I failed to complete, in a timely manner, forms
                  requested by patients and third parties.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Medical Record Keeping Course

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake that I am participating in and will
                        successfully complete the University of Toronto Course on Medical
                        Record Keeping;
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        enrollment in the University of Toronto Course on Medical Record
                        Keeping within ten (10) days of the Effective Date;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the University of Toronto Course on
                        Medical Record Keeping within ten (10) days of successful
                        completion and within eight (8) months of the Effective Date.  
                  
            (7)   Organizational Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to immediately create an organizational
                        log documenting all requests from patients and third parties for
                        documents (the "Organizational Log"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to record all information related to
                        fulfilling documentary requests from patients and third parties in
                        the Organizational Log including: the name of the requesting party
                        or parties, the date of the request(s), the date the request(s) was
                        completed and the date this completion was communicated to the
                        requesting party or parties. I also agree to append a copy of all
                        completed requests to the Organizational Log. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, agree to record information described in section
                        7(b) above in the Organizational Log within 48 hours of my office
                        receiving or becoming aware of such information. I agree to
                        maintain the Organizational Log in this manner consistently over
                        time.
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to maintain an organizational log
                        documenting all patients who are diagnosed with depression or who
                        are on anti-depressant medication (the "Mental Health Log") for the
                        duration of the Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month to review a minimum
                              of twenty (20) patient charts. Of the minimum of twenty (20)
                              patient charts, at least five (5) will be patient charts of
                              patients who are identified on the Mental Health Log and, if
                              less than five (5) patients are identified on the Mental
                              Health Log, all the patient charts of the patients identified
                              on the Mental Health Log will be included in the minimum of
                              twenty (20) patient charts reviewed; 
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month to review my
                              Organizational Log;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart review and
                              Organizational Log review;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Maintain a log of all patient information reviewed and any
                              patient charts reviewed along with a record of patient
                              identifiers;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking  is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Chadha, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Chadha, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (8)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B",  including all of the following professional
                        education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in the following:
                              1.    CPSO Medical Records Policy #4-12; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to provide a 2000-word written summary to
                        the College regarding the Professional Education. This shall
                        include a summary of the materials reviewed in the individualized
                        instruction at section (9)(a)(i) above and an explanation as to how
                        the Professional Education is applicable to my practice, and detail
                        any changes to my practice as a result of the Professional
                        Education. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its
                        sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the
                        Professional Education;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education;
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to complete this requirement within eight
                        (8) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a review of a minimum of
                        twenty-five (25) patient charts, a review of the Organizational
                        Log, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, my
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.

                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chadha, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (10)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chadha, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (10)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges at, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of the Effective Date.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chadha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chadha, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information regarding Dr. Chadha's
                              standard of practice pursuant to a chart review, and Dr.
                              Chadha was the subject of a College investigation into a
                              public complaint regarding his standard of practice and that
                              he failed to complete, in a timely manner, forms requested by
                              patients and third parties. As a result:
                  
                                   *Dr. Chadha will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six
                                    months. 
                  
                                   *Dr. Chadha will engage in professional education in
                                    record-keeping.
                  
                                   *Dr. Chadha's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College approximately six months after
                                    the completion of the Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Chadha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education set
                  out in section (9) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Chadha, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
            (21)  I, Dr. Chadha, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education set out in section (9) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (8) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ashok Kumar Chadha to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective April 18, 2017:

The College received information regarding Dr. Chadha's standard of practice pursuant to a chart review, and Dr. Chadha was the subject of a College investigation into a public complaint regarding his standard of practice and that he failed to complete, in a timely manner, forms requested by patients and third parties. As a result:

- Dr. Chadha will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

- Dr. Chadha will engage in professional education in record-keeping.

- Dr. Chadha's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)