Chadha, Uday (CPSO#: 60215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Phone: (613) 526-3377
Fax: (613) 260-1887
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1883 BANK STREET
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uday Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chadha ( CPSO# 60215 )

Business Address:
1883 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Phone Number: (613) 526-3377

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UDAY CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989