Chadi, Ahmed Sami (CPSO#: 91254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion - 13-312A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-6769
Fax: 416-603-5936
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed Sami Chadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chadi ( CPSO# 91254 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion - 13-312A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6769

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED SAMI CHADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014