Chagoya, Leopoldo (CPSO#: 42492)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Names: Chagoya, Leopoldo (used until: 18 Apr 1993 )     Chagoya Beltran, Leopoldo (used until: 24 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017