Chahine-Malus, Natalie Vikki (CPSO#: 72169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Chahine, Natalie Vikki (used until: 25 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 33100
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Chahine-Malus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chahine-Malus ( CPSO# 72169 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE VIKKI CHAHINE-MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHINE-MALUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002