Chai, Hee-Heung (CPSO#: 24403)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Humber River Regional Hospital, 2111 Finch Avenue West, Toronto, ON M3N 1N1
Date Received: 18 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015